CA AB2773 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 1577.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to unclaimed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unclaimed property voluntary disclosure program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1033.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure1577.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback