CA AB2771 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18001 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income taxes: credits: taxes paid to another state.
Sponsors
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |