CA AB2770 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 47 of the Civil Code, relating to privileged communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privileged communications: communications by former employer: sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2770 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 2770 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-09 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.).
2018-06-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-07AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5042.)
2018-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code47Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code48Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback