CA AB2769 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 459.7 to the Penal Code, relating to burglary.
Title
Burglary: freight train cargo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 459.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |