CA AB2766 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16759 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Unfair Competition Law: enforcement powers: investigatory subpoena.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2766 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2766 Maienschein By Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2766 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2766 Maienschein By Hertzberg (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2766 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 698, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 5047.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 19. Page 4816.) |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 16759 | Amended Code | Citation Text |