CA AB2765 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1720.8 to the Labor Code, relating to public works.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public works: prevailing wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2765 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2765 O'Donnell et al. By Beall (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2765 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2020-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1720.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback