CA AB2764 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 16600) to Part 1 of Division 9 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.
Title
Animals: commercial animal feeding operations: prohibition on new operations.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 16600 | New Code | See Bill Text |