CA AB2764 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10430 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State acquisition of information technology goods and services: exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2764 Chau By Wiener (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2764 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 220, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5234.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4937.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code100Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code10430Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback