CA AB2762 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2002 of, and to add and repeal Section 2003 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: disabled veteran business enterprises: local small business enterprises: social enterprises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2762 CARRILLO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2762 Carrillo et al. By Beall (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2762 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 654, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2018-08-29AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.)
2018-08-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5905.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and V.A.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5125.)
2018-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2018-04-16AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code2002Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code2003Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback