CA AB2761 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21800 of the Vehicle Code, relating to traffic signals.
Title
Yield: inoperative traffic signal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2761 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2761 |