CA AB2756 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 678, 10102, and 10103 of, and to add Section 10103.6 to, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Residential property insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2756 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2756 Limón et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2756 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2756 Limón et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2756 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 263, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5389.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2020-07-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-07-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4677.) |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10103.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 678 | Amended Code | Citation Text |