CA AB2754 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 30106 of the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Coastal Act of 1976: coastal development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30106Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3903Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback