CA AB2753 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Density bonuses: density bonus application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2753 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-12Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2018-04-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4630.)
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65915Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65915.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback