CA AB2752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 281.6 and 5895 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to communications.
Title
Broadband infrastructure and video service: mapping: subscriber information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2752 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2752 Wood et al. By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2752 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2752 Wood et al. By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2752 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5130.). |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4868.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 281.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5895 | Amended Code | Citation Text |