CA AB2752 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 42238.27 to the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: average daily attendance funding for workforce development services.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42238.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2752 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2752 |