CA AB2747 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 67451 of, and to add Sections 67452.2, 67452.3, 67454, and 67455 to, the Education Code, relating to collegiate athletes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Athlete Bill of Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2747 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5612.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code67451Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code67451.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67451.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67452.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67452.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67452.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67453.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67454New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code67455New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code11165.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback