CA AB2746 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3707 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: tax-defaulted property sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2746 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Special Consent AB2746 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2746 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6358.).
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5300.)
2018-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-17AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-05-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code35021.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code3707Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback