CA AB2744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 1569.900) to Chapter 3.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 15630 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to residential care facilities for the elderly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential care facilities for the elderly: referral agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1569.900New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code15630Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback