CA AB2744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 1569.900) to Chapter 3.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 15630 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to residential care facilities for the elderly.
Title
Residential care facilities for the elderly: referral agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1569.900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |