CA AB274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 25269.9 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Oversight costs: uncollectible accounts.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 274 E.S.& T.M. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By ALEJO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB274 Committee On E.S. & T.M. (Alejo) By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 274 E.S.& T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB274 Committee On E.S. & T.M. (Alejo) By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 274 E.S.& T.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 457, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2729.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2731.). |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2297.). |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2015-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25269.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |