CA AB2731 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 291, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 291, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.9 (commencing with Section 21189.70) to Division 13 of, and to repeal Sections 21189.70.2, 21189.70.3, 21189.70.4, 21189.70.5, 21189.70.6, and 21189.70.7 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: City of San Diego: Old Town Center redevelopment.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2731 Gloria Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2731 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2731 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2731 Gloria et al. By Atkins (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2731 Gloria Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 291, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5434.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2020-08-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-07-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4800.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21189.70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21189.70.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |