CA AB2728 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 26038 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Unlawful cannabis activity: penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-29-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2728 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2728 Smith Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4747.). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 26038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |