CA AB2725 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 27491.44 and 27491.45 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 7151.15 and 7184.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 7151.20 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to anatomical gifts.
Title
Coroners: anatomical gifts.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 27491.44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27491.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 7151.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 7151.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 7184.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |