CA AB2725 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14300 and 14306 of, and to add Section 14307.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to resources conservation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Conservation Corps: job training: construction and related fields.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code14300Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14306Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14307.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback