CA AB2722 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 4 (commencing with Section 75240) to Division 44 of the Public Resources Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transformative Climate Communities Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2722 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ( Supplemental File 1)AB 2722 Bu rke By (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2722 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-06AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
2016-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6565.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6566.).
2016-08-31SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5547.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5573.).
2016-08-23SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2016-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-08-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
2016-08-08SenateReferred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-08-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 29).
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2016-06-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5194.)
2016-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-31AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
2016-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 18).
2016-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2016-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code75240New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2722&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160412_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160420_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160531_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160802_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160816_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160819_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160831_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_bill_20160914_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160418_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160527_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160602_0109PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160808_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160811_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160831_0433PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2722_vote_20160831_0800PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback