CA AB2722 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 130232 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2014-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2014-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2014-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code130232Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback