CA AB2712 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2704.096 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to bond proceeds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Bonds: Safe, Reliable High-Speed Passenger Train Bond Act for the 21st Century.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.096 | New Code | See Bill Text |