CA AB2710 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 817 and 1526 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warrants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 2710 OBERNOLTE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2710 Obernolte By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2710 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 176, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-06AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6142.).
2018-07-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5109.).
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4824.)
2018-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1526Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code817Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback