CA AB2710 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1063.2 of, to amend, renumber, and add Sections 1063.5 and 1063.14 of, and to repeal Sections 1063.45 and 1063.135 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: California Insurance Guarantee Association: premium charges.
Sponsors
Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Assembly - AB 2710 COOLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2710 Cooley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 2710 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2710 Cooley (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 2710 COOLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 137, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5640.). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4649.). |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4262.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1063.135 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1063.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 38.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |