CA AB271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 48, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 48, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21163 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Santa Clara Valley Water District: contracts: best value procurement.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Marc Berman [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB271 Robert Rivas et al. By Laird (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 271 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - AB 271 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 48, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1066.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 21163 | New Code | See Bill Text |