CA AB2709 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50952, 50953, 51050, 51051, 51055, 51059, and 51065 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
California Housing Finance Agency: federal loan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-30 | From committee without further action. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2709&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_2701-2750/ab_2709_bill_20100219_introduced.html |