CA AB2708 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1632 and 1632.5 of the Civil Code, relating to contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts: translation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1632Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1632.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback