CA AB2703 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 17060 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income tax: credit: home care services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 7).
2018-04-30AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17060Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6001Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback