CA AB2700 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.75, 17053.76, 23675, and 23676 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income taxes: credits: job development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 14).
2018-05-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-05-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and REV. & TAX.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback