CA AB2697 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14132.36 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: community health worker services.
Sponsors
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2697 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2697 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2697 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2697 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2697 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2697 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Rubio (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2697 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 488, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 11.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5219.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 5122.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 4946.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |