CA AB2693 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71365 of, and to add Sections 71366, 71367, and 71368 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to watershed restoration, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Shasta, Trinity, and Oroville Watershed Restoration Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71366 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71367 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71368 | New Code | See Bill Text |