CA AB2693 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 910.8 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission: telecommunications service: natural disasters: reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2693 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 5628.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code454.52.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code454.57New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code910.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback