CA AB2692 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 116770) to Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: infrastructure funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116770 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2692 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2692 |