CA AB2691 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2607.5 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: Monthly Property Tax Payment Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2691 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2691 Holden By Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2691 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2691 Holden By Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2691 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6037.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4968.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 8). |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4623.) |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 5000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2607.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |