CA AB2690 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 330 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to payroll.
Title
Employment Development Department: Franchise Tax Board: report: payroll charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 330 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2690 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2690 |