CA AB2690 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130232 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2690 Ridley-Thomas (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2690 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2690 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 204, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4500.) |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 130232 | Amended Code | Citation Text |