CA AB2685 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 65585 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing elements: adoption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2685 Lopez By Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - AB 2685 LOPEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2016-08-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5055.).
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2016-05-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4960.)
2016-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2016-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2016-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2016-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-25AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20).
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2016-04-07AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4218.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2016-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2016-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2016-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2016-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65585Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2685&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160425_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160511_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160818_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20160909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160420_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160527_1038AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160621_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20160817_1142AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback