CA AB2685 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6140 and 6141 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorneys: annual membership fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2685 Committee on JUD. (Feuer) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2685 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
2012-08-28 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2012-08-27 Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-08-14 In Senate. Held at Desk.
2012-08-13 Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-09 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2012-08-09 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4444.).
2012-07-06 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-07-05 From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2012-05-24 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-05-10 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-05-10 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4782.)
2012-05-09 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-08 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2012-03-19 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-03-13 From printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
2012-03-12 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6140Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code6141Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2685&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20120312_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20120907_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_bill_20120917_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20120508_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20120510_1106AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20120703_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2651-2700/ab_2685_vote_20120809_1122AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback