CA AB2684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 876, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 876, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2032.010 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 7541, 7552.5, 7556, 7558, 7604, 7613, 7630, 7635, 7640, 7645, 7646, 7647, 7647.7, 7648, 7649, and 7650 of, to amend the headings of Article 1 (commencing with Section 7630) and Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 7645) of Chapter 4 of Part 3 of Division 12 of, to amend the headings of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 7550) and Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 7570) of Part 2 of Division 12 of, to amend the heading of Part 2 (commencing with Section 7540) of Division 12 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7570, 7571, 7572, 7573, 7574, 7575, 7576, 7577, 7612, 7644, and 17412 of, to add Sections 7550.5, 7559, 7560, 7562, 7573.5, 7578, 7580, and 7581 to, and to repeal and add Sections 7540, 7550, 7551, 7552, 7554, and 7555 of, the Family Code, and to amend Sections 1635, 1644, 102766, and 102767 of, to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 102766) of Chapter 5 of Part 1 of Division 102 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 102625) of Part 1 of Division 102 of, and to add Sections 1644.1, 1644.2, and 1644.3 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to parentage.
Title
Parent and child relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2684 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2684 Bloom et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2684 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2684 Bloom et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2684 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 876, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 7032.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 5994.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5123.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |