CA AB2681 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 12.2.5 (commencing with Section 8875.100) to Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 8875.109 of, the Government Code, relating to seismic safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seismic safety: potentially vulnerable buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2681 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2681 Nazarian et al. By Beall (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2681 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6638.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5598.).
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-14SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and G.O.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5611.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
2018-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2018-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8875.100New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8875.109Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback