CA AB2680 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41821.5 of, and to add Sections 40146 and 41823 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: green material: land application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 40146 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 41821.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 41823 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2680 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2680 |