CA AB2679 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1275.8 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: linen laundry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2679 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2679 O'Donnell By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2679 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2679 O'Donnell By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2679 O'DONNELL Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7005.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5971.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5006.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1275.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1276 | Amended Code | Citation Text |