CA AB2677 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3.1 (commencing with Section 71119) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Lead contamination: Exide Technologies facility: community liaison.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2677 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2677 |