CA AB267 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4799.05 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: prescribed fire, thinning, and fuel reduction projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 267 Valladares Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-03-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-01-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
2021-01-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code4799.05Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback