CA AB267 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 912 of, and to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 965) to Chapter 4 of Division 8 of, the Evidence Code, relating to evidentiary privileges.
Title
Evidentiary privileges: lawyer referral service-client privilege.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB267 Chau By Evans (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 267 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Assembly - AB 267 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 123, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1685.). |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 995.) |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 2). |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 912 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 965 | New Code | See Bill Text |